S. NO | NAME OF HON'BLE JUDGE | TENURE AS JUDGE OF M.P. HIGH COURT | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Shri B.K. Choudhari (EXP.) | 01/11/1956 | 02/04/1958 | |
2 | Shri V.R. Sen (EXP. ON 19/11/1969) | 01/11/1956 | 14/12/1958 | |
3 | Shri T.P. Naik (EXP.) | 01/11/1956 | 08/05/1972 | |
4 | Shri A.H. Khan (EXP.) | 01/11/1956 | 20/03/1968 | |
5 | Shri V.R. Nevaskar (EXP.) | 01/11/1956 | 20/03/1968 | |
6 | Shri S.M. Samvatsar (EXP.) | 01/11/1956 | 10/11/1957 | |
7 | Shri B.K. Chaturvedi (EXP.) | 12/03/1957 | 10/04/1958 | |
8 | Shri T.C. Shrivastava (EXP.) | 12/03/1957 | 06/09/1962 | |
9 | Shri H.R. Krishnan (EXP.) | 06/01/1958 | 09/01/1972 | |
10 | Shri K.L. Pandey (EXP.) | 26/09/1958 | 20/09/1971 | |
11 | Shri S.B. Sen (EXP.) | 13/04/1959 | 01/10/1972 | |
12 | Shri N.M. Golwalker (EXP.) | 13/04/1959 | 20/09/1970 | |
13 | Shri P.R. Sharma (EXP.) | 13/04/1959 | 02/02/1971 | |
14 | Shri S.P. Bahrgava (EXP. on 28/12/93) | 27/06/1960 | 19/08/1973 | |
15 | Shri C.B. Kekre (EXP on 21/03/1969) | 27/06/1960 | 26/06/1962 | |
16 | Shri M.A. Razzaque (EXP.) | 27/06/1960 | 01/04/1970 | |
17 | Shri R.J. Bhave (EXP.) | 27/06/1960 | 14/03/1976 | |
18 | Shri Suraj Bhan Grover (EXP.) | 06/12/1965 | 03/02/1971 | |
19 | Shri C. Kondaiah (EXP.) | 24/06/1976 | 27/10/1977 | |
20 | Shri C.M. Lodha (EXP.) out of State | 28/06/1976 | 06/07/1978 | |
21 | Shri S.M.N. Raina (EXP.) | 29/07/1968 | 20/05/1977 | |
22 | Shri S.R. Vyas (EXP on 12/06/1990) | 19/06/1970 | 21/02/1980 | |
23 | Shri K.K. Dube (EXP.) | 11/12/1970 | 01/05/1982 | |
24 | Shri N.C. Dwivedi (EXP.) | 15/02/1971 | 02/09/1981 | |
25 | Shri R.K. Tankha (EXP.) | 15/09/1972 | 29/05/1988 | |
26 | Shri M.L. Malik (EXP.on 21/05/1997) | 02/06/1973 | 05/05/1983 | |
27 | Shri R.L. Murab (EXP.) | 02/06/1973 | 15/10/1982 | |
28 | Shri B.R. Dube (EXP.) | 05/02/1974 | 21/08/1979 | |
29 | Shri U.N. Bhachawat (EXP.) | 05/02/1974 | 15/06/1985 | |
30 | Shri C.P. Sen (EXP.) | 05/02/1974 | 07/02/1989 | |
31 | Shri G.G. Sohani (EXP.) | 02/06/1974 | 18/12/1990 | |
32 | Shri S.S. Sharma(EXP.) | 24/06/1974 | 02/04/1987 | |
33 | Shri P.D. Mulye (EXP.) | 07/07/1975 | 04/10/1988 | |
34 | Shri J.P. Bajpai (EXP.) | 07/07/1975 | 02/10/1991 | |
35 | Shri A.R. Naokar (EXP on 05/02/1986) | 01/12/1977 | 31/08/1982 | |
36 | Shri S.J. Surana (EXP.) | 01/12/1977 | 10/01/1981 | |
37 | Shri H.G. Mishra (EXP on 23/07/1982) | 01/12/1977 | 23/07/1982 | |
38 | Shri Chandrapal Singh (EXP) | 16/03/1978 | 04/11/1985 | |
39 | Shri R.C. Vijaya Vargiya | 21/08/1978 | 10/01/1986 | |
40 | Shri B.C. Verma (EXP.) | 21/08/1978 | 16/09/1991 | |
41 | Shri S.K. Seth (EXP) | 27/11/1978 | 18/06/1983 | |
42 | Shri Faizanuddin (EXP.) | 27/11/1978 | 05/02/1994 | |
43 | Shri R.C. Shrivastava (EXP.) | 02/11/1979 | 25/01/1989 | |
44 | Shri M.D. Bhatt (EXP.) | 02/11/1979 | 25/01/1989 | |
45 | Shri K.N. Shukla (EXP.) | 02/11/1979 | 25/01/1989 | |
46 | Dr. T.N. Singh (EXP.) | 06/05/1982 | 20/03/1993 | |
47 | Shri N.K. Singh (EXP.) | 07/04/1983 | 08/06/1990 | |
48 | Shri K.K. Adhikari (EXP.) | 07/04/1983 | 28/04/1989 | |
49 | Shri Gulab Gupta (EXP.) | 20/05/1983 | 23/04/1994 | |
50 | Shri B.M. Lal (EXP.) | 14/05/1984 | 22/03/1991 | |
51 | Shri K.K. Verma (EXP.) | 14/05/1984 | 04/01/1993 | |
52 | Shri K.L. Shrivastava (EXP.) | 14/05/1984 | 10/12/1990 | |
53 | Shri P.C. Pathak (EXP.) | 14/05/1984 | 06/01/1992 | |
54 | Shri K.M. Agrawal (EXP.) | 14/05/1984 | 23/04/1994 | |
55 | Shri R.P. Singh (EXP.on30/01/1997) | 14/05/1984 | 10/02/1990 | |
56 | Shri Sachchidanand Awasthy (EXP.) | 14/05/1984 | 12/08/1990 | |
57 | Shri R.K. Verma (EXP.) | 14/05/1984 | 31/07/1992 | |
58 | Shri V.D. Gyani | 14/05/1984 | 23/04/1994 | |
59 | Shri B.B.L. Shrivastava (EXP.) | 04/07/1986 | 11/03/1991 | |
60 | Shri A.G. Qureshi(EXP.) | 04/07/1986 | 06/12/1994 | |
61 | Shri I.P. Rao (EXP.) | 20/06/1994 | 21/04/1995 | |
62 | Shri R. M. Rustogi (EXP.) | 22/01/1987 | 10/06/1989 | |
63 | Shri Y.B. Suryavanshi(EXP.) | 22/01/1987 | 07/09/1990 | |
64 | Shri S.K. Dubey | 02/03/1988 | 14/08/1998 | |
65 | Shri R.C. Lahoti (former C.J.I.) (EXP.) | 03/05/1988 | 01/02/1994 | |
66 | Shri D.P.S. Chauhan | 28/04/1994 | 25/03/2000 | |
67 | Shri S.D. Jha (EXP.) | 24/03/1989 | 28/04/1994 | |
68 | Shri D.M. Dharmadhikari | 24/03/1989 | 21/01/2000 | |
69 | Shri N.P. Singh (EXP.) | 24/04/1994 | 11/09/1999 | |
70 | Shri K.L. Issrani (EXP.) | 28/07/1990 | 23/04/1994 | |
71 | Shri Shacheendra Dwivedi (EXP.) | 28/07/1990 | 25/01/1999 | |
72 | Shri V.S. Kokje | 28/07/1990 | 23/04/1994 | |
73 | Shri R.D. Shukla (EXP.) | 28/07/1990 | 09/05/1998 | |
74 | Shri S.K. Chawla (EXP.) | 28/07/1990 | 28/05/1994 | |
75 | Shri P.N.S. Chauhan | 28/07/1990 | 15/10/1995 | |
76 | Shri R.D. Vyas | 28/04/1994 | 06/04/2001 | |
77 | Shri B.A. Khan | 12/11/1990 | 13/01/2000 | |
78 | Shri M.W. Deo (EXP. on 05/01/1997) | 28/12/1990 | 08/08/1994 | |
79 | Shri K.M. Pandey (EXP.) | 24/01/1991 | 28/03/1994 | |
80 | Shri S.P. Shrivastava, (EXP.) | 10/12/1997 | 06/04/2002 | |
81 | Shri A.S. Tripathi (EXP. on 22/11/1994) | 28/04/1994 | 15/07/1998 | |
82 | Shri M.V. Tamasker (EXP.) | 15/06/1992 | 15/09/1995 | |
83 | Shri A.R. Tiwari (EXP.) | 15/06/1992 | 30/06/1998 | |
84 | Shri P.P. Naolekar | 15/06/1992 | 23/04/1994 | |
85 | Shri D.K. Jain | 01/07/1992 | 05/10/1996 | |
86 | Shri R.P. Awasthy (EXP.) | 01/07/1992 | 03/07/1996 | |
87 | Shri J.G. Chitre (EXP.) | 08/02/1994 | 30/08/2001 | |
88 | Shri Tej Shanker (EXP.) | 14/02/1994 | 05/04/1999 | |
89 | Shri Tejinder Singh Doabia | 02/03/1994 | 06/12/1997 | |
90 | Shri P.C. Nayak (Tr. to Chhattisgarh) | 16/03/1994 | 23/03/1994 | |
91 | Shri K.S. Shrivastava | 27/09/1994 | 28/09/1994 | |
92 | Dr. Maithili Sharan | 27/09/1994 | 12/06/2001 | |
93 | Shri D.K. Jain | 27/09/1994 | 28/09/1994 | |
94 | Smt. Sarojni Saxena (EXP.on15/03/03) | 27/09/1994 | 28/09/1994 | |
95 | Shri M.S.A. Siddiqui | 27/09/1994 | 28/09/1994 | |
96 | Shri S.K. Tiwari (EXP.) | 27/09/1994 | 28/09/1994 | |
97 | Shri Rajeev Gupta | 27/09/1994 | 21/04/2005 | |
98 | Shri Ram Prakash Gupta (EXP.) | 06/05/1996 | 01/12/1999 | |
99 | Shri C.K. Prasad | 21/11/1994 | 06/09/2001 | |
100 | Shri Fakhruddin (Tr. to Chhattisgarh)(EXP.) | 15/12/1994 | 18/05/2001 | |
101 | Shri Ramesh Surajmal Garg | 15/12/1994 | 31-10-2000 Joined as Judge MP High Court on 17-09-2007 to 15-04-2010 | |
102 | Shri Deepak Verma | 15/12/1994 | 01/01/2008 | |
103 | Shri S.B. Sakrikar | 19/06/1995 | 29/12/2002 | |
104 | Shri S.C. Pandey | 06/09/1995 | 09/09/2001 | |
105 | Shri V.K. Agarwal | 06/09/1995 | 07/11/2002 | |
106 | Shri N.K. Jain | 06/09/1995 | 30/09/2003 | |
107 | Shri Dipak Misra | 17/01/1996 | 21/12/2009 | |
108 | Shri S.K. Kulshreshtha | 24/01/1996 | 01/10/2008 | |
109 | Shri S.S. Jha | 24/01/1996 | 15/10/2007 | |
110 | Shri Shambhoo Singh | 24/01/1996 | 05/07/2001 | |
111 | Miss Usha Shukla | 24/01/1996 | 21/09/2003 | |
112 | Shri S.P. Khare | 17/03/1997 | 25/10/2004 | |
113 | Shri Sushil Harkauli | 05/02/1999 | 10/10/2012 | |
114 | Shri A.K. Gohil | 26/04/1999 | 01/07/2008 | |
115 | Shri R.B. Dixit | 26/04/1999 | 22/06/2003 | |
116 | Shri N.G. Karambelkar | 26/04/1999 | 12/03/2002 | |
117 | Shri S.S. Saraf (EXP.) | 26/04/1999 | 08/07/2002 | |
118 | Shri A.K. Mishra | 25/10/1999 | 09/09/2010 | |
119 | Shri A.M. Sapre | 25/10/1999 | 08/02/2010 | |
120 | Shri S.L. Kochar | 22/10/2001 | 26/10/2010 | |
121 | Shri K.K. Lahoti | 22/10/2001 | 06/03/2014 | |
122 | Shri U.N. Singh | 22/10/2001 | 29/11/2004 | |
123 | Shri Narayan Singh 'AZAD' (EXP.) | 22/10/2001 | 15/06/2004 | |
124 | Shri P.C. Agarwal (EXP.) | 22/10/2001 | 06/01/2005 | |
125 | Shri Chandresh Bhushan (EXP.) | 22/10/2001 | 02/11/2005 | |
126 | Shri Vishnu Deo Narayan | 07/12/2004 | 13/08/2005 | |
127 | Shri Subhash Samwatsar | 01/04/2002 | 20/12/2009 | |
128 | Shri Sugandhi Lal Jain | 01/04/2002 | 05/06/2007 | |
129 | Shri Ajit Singh | 01/04/2002 | 19/03/2015 | |
130 | Shri Vinay Mittal | 07/07/2002 | 30/12/2010 | |
131 | Shri A.K. Shrivastava | 02/09/2002 | 31/01/2014 | |
132 | Shri S.K. Pande | 21/03/2003 | 04/08/2006 | |
133 | Shri A.K. Awasthy | 21/03/2003 | 20/02/2006 | |
134 | Shri Ashok Kumar Tiwari | 08/09/2003 | 06/06/2006 | |
135 | Shri Rakesh Saksena | 11/10/2004 | 08/09/2013 | |
136 | Shri N.K. Mody | 11/10/2004 | 06/12/2013 | |
137 | Miss Sheela Khanna | 11/10/2004 | 07/10/2008 | |
138 | Shri Abhay M. Naik | 13/04/2005 | 08/09/2011 | |
139 | Shri W.A. Shah | 13/04/2005 | 31/12/2008 | |
140 | Shri A.K. Saxena | 13/04/2005 | 30/06/2009 | |
141 | Shri Ram Kishore Gupta | 18/10/2005 | Resignation on 30/11/2010 | |
142 | Smt. Manjusha Namjoshi (EXP.) | 18/10/2005 | 21/08/2009 | |
143 | Shri Shyam Sunder Dwivedi | 18/10/2005 | 31/08/2010 | |
144 | Shri Syed Ali Naqvi | 18/10/2005 | 24/12/2009 | |
145 | Shri Subhash Chandra Vyas (EXP.) | 18/10/2005 | 18/04/2008 | |
146 | Shri B.M. Gupta | 25/11/2005 | 20/08/2009 | |
147 | Shri A.P. Shrivastava | 25/11/2005 | 26/11/2009 | |
148 | Shri S.N. Aggarwal | 28/02/2006 | 25/08/2012 | |
149 | Smt. Sushma Shrivastava | 15/05/2006 | 12/11/2011 | |
150 | Shri S.C. Sinho | 15/05/2006 | 20/08/2012 | |
151 | Shri R.C. Mishra | 11/09/2006 | 03/06/2013 | |
152 | Shri Kedar Singh Chauhan | 02/03/2007 | 06/05/2010 | |
153 | Smt. Indrani Datta | 01/07/2008 | 16/11/2011 | |
154 | Shri I.S. Shrivastava | 25/08/2009 | 16/12/2011 | |
155 | Shri Piyush Mathur | 14/10/2009 | Resignation on 01/09/2010 | |
156 | Shri Alok Aradhe | 29/12/2009 | 15/09/2016 (Transfer to Jammu & Shri Nagar High Court) | |
157 | Shri B.K. Dube | 03/05/2010 | 20/01/2014 | |
158 | Shri Anil Kumar Sharma | 03/05/2010 | 01/10/2014 | |
159 | Smt. Vimla Jain | 13/09/2010 | 11/06/2014 | |
160 | Shri M.A. Siddiqui | 13/09/2010 | 01/07/2013 | |
161 | Shri G.D.Saxena | 03/01/2011 | 02/04/2014 | |
162 | Shri G.S. Solanki | 03/05/2010 | 06/09/2015 | |
163 | Shri T.K. Kaushal | 03/01/2010 | 08/09/2015 | |
164 | Shri B.D. Rathi | 01/04/2013 | 16/09/2015 | |
165 | Shri K.K. Trivedi | 27/05/2011 | 10/01/2016 | |
166 | Smt S. R. Waghmare (sad demise) | 11/10/2004 | 13/04/2016 | |
167 | Shri S. K. Gupta | 28/02/2014 | 11/05/2016 | |
168 | Shri M.C. Garg (PHC Delhi) | 18/04/2011 | 09/06/2016 | |
169 | Shri U.C. Maheshwari | 11/10/2004 | Resignation on 27/06/2016 | |
170 | Shri S. S. Kemkar | 21/03/2003 | 15/04/2016 (Transfer to Bombay High Court) | |
171 | Shri Rajendra Menon | 01/04/2002 | 14/03/2017 | |
172 | Shri N. K. Gupta | 03/05/2010 | 30/06/2017 | |
173 | Shri Subhash Kakade | 01/04/2013 | 23/01/2017 | |
174 | Shri M. K. Mudgal | 01/04/2013 | 28/08/2016 | |
175 | Shri D. K. Paliwal | 01/04/2013 | 16/03/2017 | |
176 | Shri Jarat Kumar Jain | 28/02/2014 | 22/01/2017 | |
177 | Shri Alok Verma | 30/06/2014 | 27/11/2017 | |
178 | Shri S. K. Gangele | 11/10/2004 | 25/07/2018 | |
179 | Shri Sushil Kumar Palo | 15/04/2014 | 01/11/2018 | |
180 | Shri Rajendra Mahajan | 25/10/2014 | 06/03/2018 | |
181 | Shri Ved Prakash Sharma | 07/04/2016 | 01/01/2018 | |
182 | Shri Anurag Kumar Shrivastava | 07/04/2016 | 10/04/2018 | |
183 | Shri Housla Prasad Singh | 07/04/2016 | 30/06/2018 | |
184 | Shri Ashok Kumar Joshi | 07/04/2016 | 10/11/2018 | |
185 | Shri S. K. Seth (EXP.) | 21/03/2003 | 09/06/2019 | |
186 | Shri Chandrahas Sirpurkar | 25/10/2014 | 03/03/2019 | |
187 | Shri Huluvadi G. Ramesh | 15/11/2018 | 19/05/2019 | |
188 | Shri Pankaj Kumar Jaiswal | 11/10/2004 | 04/02/2019 (Transfer to Allahabad High Court) | |
189 | Shri Ravi Shankar Jha | 18/10/2005 | 06/10/2019 (Transfer to High Court of Punjab and Haryana) | |
190 | Shri J. K. Maheshwari | 25/11/2005 | 06/10/2019 (Transfer to Andhra Pradesh High Court) | |
191 | Sushri Vandana Kasrekar | 25/10/2014 | 13/12/2020 (Demise) | |
192 | Shri Sunil Kumar Awasthi | 13/10/2016 | Resignation on 02/01/2021 | |
193 | Shri Satish Chandra Sharma | 18/01/2008 | 04/01/2021 (Transfer to Karnataka High Court) | |
194 | Shri Sanjay Yadav | 02/03/2007 | 07/01/2021 (Transfer to Allahabad High Court) | |
195 | Shri Vishnu Pratap Singh Chauhan | 19/11/2018 | 15/03/2021 | |
196 | Shri Jagdish Prasad Gupta | 07/04/2016 | 20/03/2021 | |
197 | Shri Mohd. Fahim Anwar | 19/06/2018 | 04/04/2021 | |
198 | Shri B.K. Shrivastava | 19/06/2018 | 30/06/2021 | |
199 | Shri Akhil Kumar Srivastava | 19/06/2018 | 04/08/2021 | |
200 | Shri Prakash Shrivastava | 18/01/2008 | 10/10/2021 (Elevated as The Chief Justice of Calcutta High Court) | |
201 | Shri Shailendra Shukla | 19/11/2018 | 16/11/2021 | |
202 | Shri Rajendra Kumar Srivastava | 19/06/2018 | 31/12/2021 | |
203 | Shri Satish Kumar Sharma | 25/11/2021 | 24/05/2022 | |
204 | Shri Purushaindra Kumar Kaurav | 08/10/2021 | 01/06/2022 (Transfer to Delhi High Court) |